WY HB0048 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - COW:Failed 5-55-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to branding and ranging; specifying that the livestock board shall send brand rerecording notices by email and mail; repealing the certified mail requirement for brand rerecording notices; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Brand rerecording notices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-11 - House - COW:Failed 5-55-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-11 - House - COW:Failed 5-55-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-11 - House - COW:Failed 5-55-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-10 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-11HouseCOW:Failed 5-55-0-0-0
2019-01-10HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-10HouseH05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-12-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback