WY HB0048 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-5-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-5-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the legislature; providing for an indication of local government costs in fiscal notes as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Fiscal information in legislation.
Sponsors
Sen. Cheri Steinmetz [R] | Sen. Dennis Biteman [R] | Rep. Roy Edwards [R] | Rep. Michael Madden [R] |
Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-5-0- (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-5-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-5-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-5-0- | |
2017-02-03 | House | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2017-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-19 | Bill Number Assigned |