WY HB0048 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to administration of government; requiring public reports on the use of the governor's exercise of specified budget powers, on state agency contracts for services and supplies and on revenues received by state agencies as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State spending and revenues-public reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 44-14-2-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 44-14-2-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 44-14-2-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 44-14-2-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Did Not Consider for Introduction |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2016-02-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-16 | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 44-14-2-0-0 |
2016-02-05 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-01-26 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Digest/HB0048.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Introduced/HB0048.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Digest/HB0048.pdf |