WY HB0048 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to fishing; providing for use of artificial light or lighting devices while fishing; providing for rules and regulations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Fishing with artificial light.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] | Rep. Stan Blake [D] | Rep. John Freeman [D] | Rep. Allen Jaggi [R] |
Sen. Larry Hicks [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - H06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H06 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - H06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H06 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2014-03-06 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0043 | |
2014-03-05 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0043 |
2014-03-04 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0043 |
2014-03-04 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0043 | |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed COW |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed COW |
2014-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-14 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 |
2014-02-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-01-15 | Bill Number Assigned |