WY HB0047 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Assigned Chapter Number 110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Assigned Chapter Number 110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation and revenue; authorizing an election on the question of permanently imposing a portion of the local general purpose sales and use taxes; decreasing the number of local entities required to approve provisions related to specified local sales and use taxes; increasing the amount of time between elections for specified local sales and use taxes; authorizing the implementation of an optional municipal sales and use taxes as specified; providing procedures; amending related provisions; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Local sales and use taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Adopted HB0047JC001: 16-14-0-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - Adopted HB0047JC001: 42-16-2-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Concur:Failed 12-48-0-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-8-2-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Amendment adopted 15-13-2-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Amendment adopted 16-14-0-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Amendment failed 12-18-0-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-28 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 42-17-1-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - Adopted HB0047JC001: 42-16-2-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Concur:Failed 12-48-0-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-8-2-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Amendment adopted 15-13-2-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Amendment adopted 16-14-0-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Amendment failed 12-18-0-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-28 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 42-17-1-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Assigned Chapter Number 110 | |
2020-03-13 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0070 | |
2020-03-11 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0070 |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0070 |
2020-03-10 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0070 | |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2020-03-05 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2020-03-05 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2020-03-05 | House | Concur:Failed 12-48-0-0-0 |
2020-03-04 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 20-8-2-0-0 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-02 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-28 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-18 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0 |
2020-02-17 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-14 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2020-02-13 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-12 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 42-17-1-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-01-13 | Bill Number Assigned |