WY HB0047 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to refugee resettlement; requiring legislative approval of a refugee resettlement plan; providing for assignment to a committee; providing for public hearings; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Refugee resettlement plan accountability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-9-0-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-9-0-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 44-14-2-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 44-14-2-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-9-0-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 44-14-2-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 44-14-2-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Did Not Consider for Introduction |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 51-9-0-0-0 |
2016-02-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2016-02-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-12 | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 | |
2016-02-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 44-14-2-0-0 |
2016-02-05 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-01-26 | Bill Number Assigned |