WY HB0045 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-05 - Chapter No. 123 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-05 - Chapter No. 123 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the insurance code; excluding health care sharing ministries from the provisions of the insurance code; providing a definition; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Health care sharing ministry.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Rep. John Eklund [R] | Rep. Sue Wilson [R] | Sen. Ray Peterson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-27 - House - Concur:Passed 55-0-5-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Concur:Passed 55-0-5-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Concur:Passed 55-0-5-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | Chapter No. 123 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-05 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-05 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0082 | |
2015-03-03 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0082 |
2015-03-02 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0082 |
2015-02-27 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0082 | |
2015-02-27 | House | Concur:Passed 55-0-5-0-0 |
2015-02-27 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2015-02-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-25 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-24 | Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 | |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-30 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2015-01-29 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-28 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-27 | Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2015-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-02 | Bill Number Assigned |