WY HB0044 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 134
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to legal time; requiring the state to observe a time zone as specified; establishing a new uniform state time; specifying contingencies; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mountain daylight time preservation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - Concur:Passed 45-13-2-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-11-2-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 32-27-1-0-0 (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 43-15-2-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26 Assigned Chapter Number 134
2020-03-24 Governor Signed HEA No. 0087
2020-03-12SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0087
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0087
2020-03-12 Assigned Number HEA No. 0087
2020-03-12HouseConcur:Passed 45-13-2-0-0
2020-03-11HouseReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-11Senate3rd Reading:Passed 17-11-2-0-0
2020-03-10Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-09SenateCOW:Passed
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on General File
2020-03-04SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
2020-03-03SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2020-02-27SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-26House3rd Reading:Passed 32-27-1-0-0
2020-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-24HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-17HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-17HouseH06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2020-02-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 43-15-2-0-0
2020-02-07HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-01-13 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback