WY HB0042 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 26 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - President Signed HEA No. 0111
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to land use planning; repealing provisions related to state level land use planning act; repealing specified provisions for local zoning and land use planning; providing conforming amendments; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land use planning.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-26 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-27SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0111
2013-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0111
2013-02-26 Assigned Number HEA0111
2013-02-26SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-25SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-22SenatePassed CoW
2013-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2013-02-12SenateRecommended Do Pass
2013-01-25SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07
2013-01-22SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-01-22HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-01-21HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-01-18HousePassed CoW
2013-01-17HousePlaced on General File
2013-01-17HouseRecommended Do Pass
2013-01-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07
2013-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2012-12-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback