WY HB0041 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to intrastate crowdfunding; increasing the dollar amount qualifying for an exemption from securities regulation; removing the dollar limit on funding received from nonaccredited investors; removing and amending reporting requirements; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Intrastate crowdfunding exemption-amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-6-0-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-0-1-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05 Assigned Chapter Number 89
2021-04-05 Governor Signed HEA No. 0060
2021-04-01SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0060
2021-04-01HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0060
2021-04-01 Assigned Number HEA No. 0060
2021-03-31Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2021-03-30Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-29SenateCOW:Passed
2021-03-26SenatePlaced on General File
2021-03-26SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2021-03-17SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2021-03-04SenateReceived for Introduction
2021-03-03House3rd Reading:Passed 54-6-0-0-0
2021-03-02House2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-01HouseCOW:Passed
2021-03-01HousePlaced on General File
2021-03-01HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-0-1-0
2021-02-05HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseReceived for Introduction
2021-01-06 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback