WY HB0041 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the University of Wyoming; modifying appellations; allowing an increase in University of Wyoming board of trustees executive committee members; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UW board of trustees-chairman.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-0-9-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 110
2019-02-26 Governor Signed HEA No. 0044
2019-02-20SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0044
2019-02-20HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0044
2019-02-19 Assigned Number HEA No. 0044
2019-02-19Senate3rd Reading:Passed 22-7-1-0-0
2019-02-15Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-14SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-11SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-11SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2019-01-16SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-16House3rd Reading:Passed 51-0-9-0-0
2019-01-15House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-14HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-14HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-14HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-12-27 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback