WY HB0040 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 157
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to school finance; creating the select committee on school finance recalibration; providing for a study to recalibrate the education resource block grant model; authorizing the use of consultants; requiring a report; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School finance - model recalibration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Adopted HB0040JC001: 26-1-3-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Adopted HB0040JC001: 48-9-3-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Concur:Failed 12-47-1-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-03-09 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26 Assigned Chapter Number 157
2020-03-26 Became Law without Governor's Signature
2020-03-12SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0096
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0096
2020-03-12 Assigned Number HEA No. 0096
2020-03-11SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-11HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-10HouseConcur:Failed 12-47-1-0-0
2020-03-09HouseReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-09Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2020-03-06Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-05SenateCOW:Passed
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on General File
2020-03-04SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-03-02Senate:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2020-03-02SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-02-26SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2020-02-26SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-25House3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0
2020-02-24House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-21House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2020-02-20HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-17HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-17HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2020-02-14HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2020-02-13HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-13HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2020-02-10HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education 59-0-1-0-0
2020-02-07HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-01-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0040
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Introduced/HB0040.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Engross/HB0040.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Enroll/HB0040.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Fiscal/HB0040.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0040#5018
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0040#-133
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0040#-242
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0040#5329
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0040#-569
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0040#-626
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0040#575
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0040#5517
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0040#5586
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0040#661

Bill Comments

feedback