WY HB0039 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Chapter No. 31 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Chapter No. 31 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to resident tuition reimbursement for K-12 public schools; modifying payment for resident students to attend school out of state as specified; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Education-resident tuition reimbursement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Chapter No. 31 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-02-21 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0022 | |
2017-02-15 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0022 |
2017-02-14 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0022 |
2017-02-13 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0022 | |
2017-02-13 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2017-02-10 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-09 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-06 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-19 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2017-01-18 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-17 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-17 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2017-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-15 | Bill Number Assigned |