WY HB0036 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - H05 - Agriculture:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to food and drugs; increasing the pesticide registration fee; specifying distribution and use of the fee; providing for a continuous appropriation; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pesticide registration fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 50-9-1-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26HouseH05 - Agriculture:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2020-02-26SenateS05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-02-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
2020-02-18SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-17House3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0
2020-02-14House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-13HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-12HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-12HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2020-02-11HouseH05 - Agriculture:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2020-02-11HouseH05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2020-02-10HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 50-9-1-0-0
2020-02-07HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-01-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback