WY HB0036 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; authorizing counties to conduct mail ballot elections; specifying requirements and procedures; prohibiting multiple voting; providing for rulemaking; revising the timeline for possession of ballots by county clerks; making conforming amendments; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Mail ballot elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-11 - House - H07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 3-4-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2019-01-11 | House | H07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 3-4-2-0-0 |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2019-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-24 | Bill Number Assigned |