WY HB0036 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Chapter No. 41 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Chapter No. 41 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the general revision of laws; amending archaic and obsolete provisions; repealing fully executed or otherwise archaic and obsolete provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Obsolete laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - H12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 13-0-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - H12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 13-0-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Chapter No. 41 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-02-21 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0032 | |
2017-02-15 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0032 |
2017-02-15 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0032 |
2017-02-15 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0032 | |
2017-02-15 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-09 | Senate | S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-02-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2017-02-03 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-02 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-16 | House | H12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 13-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H12 - Rules |
2017-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-13 | Bill Number Assigned |