WY HB0035 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Failed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to search and rescue operations; providing immunity for volunteers as specified; repealing application of the Governmental Claims Act and local government self-insurance program to search and rescue operation volunteers; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Search and rescue operations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-26 - Senate - S Failed 3rd Reading (Y: 6 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-26SenateFailed 3rd Reading
2013-02-25SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-22SenatePassed CoW
2013-02-07SenatePlaced on General File
2013-02-07SenateRecommended Do Pass
2013-01-25SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07
2013-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-01-23HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-01-22HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-01-21HousePassed CoW
2013-01-21 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-21HouseAmendments Adopted
2013-01-17HousePlaced on General File
2013-01-17HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07
2013-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2012-12-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback