WY HB0034 | 2014 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to municipal solid waste facilities cease and transfer grant and loan program; modifying requirements for engineered containment systems or performance based design standards; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solid waste cease and transfer eligibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - S09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - H09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - H09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H09 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H09 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-11 Assigned Chapter Number
2014-03-10 Governor Signed HEA0015
2014-03-04SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0015
2014-02-28HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0015
2014-02-28 Assigned Number HEA0015
2014-02-28SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-27SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-26SenateLaid Back Without Prejudice
2014-02-25SenatePassed CoW
2014-02-24SenatePlaced on General File
2014-02-24SenateRecommended Do Pass
2014-02-19SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09
2014-02-18SenateReceived for Introduction
2014-02-17HousePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-14HousePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-13HousePassed CoW
2014-02-13 Amendment Adopted
2014-02-13HouseAmendments Adopted
2014-02-13 Amendment Failed
2014-02-12HousePlaced on General File
2014-02-12HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2014-02-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09
2014-02-10HouseReceived for Introduction
2014-01-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback