WY HB0034 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation and revenue; providing an exemption from sales and use tax for firearms as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Sales and use tax exemption-firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | House | Died In Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | Introduced and referred to H03; No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2013-01-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 |
2013-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2012-12-07 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0034.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/HB0034.pdf |