WY HB0033 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-17 - Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-17 - Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to consumer protection; providing disclosure requirements for roofing solicitations, roofing proposals and roofing repair contracts; providing for cancellation of roofing contracts; providing remedies; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Roofing contractors.
Sponsors
Rep. James Byrd [D] | Sen. Glenn Moniz [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-17 - House - H Failed CoW; Indef Postponed (Y: 20 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-01-16 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-17 | House | Failed CoW; Indef Postponed |
2013-01-17 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-17 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-16 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 |
2013-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2012-12-06 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0033.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/HB0033.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0033.htm |