WY HB0032 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health and safety; requiring health care facilities, governmental entities and providers of essential services to offer reasonable accommodations as specified to persons unable or unwilling to provide proof of immunization; providing for a vaccine monitoring period before an immunization may be mandated for school children; providing that requiring immunization as a condition of employment is a discriminatory or unfair employment practice as specified; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Vaccine requirements-limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - H10 - Labor:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-15 - House - Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor 45-15-0-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor 45-15-0-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2022-02-25 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2022-02-16 | House | H10 - Labor:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 |
2022-02-15 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor 45-15-0-0-0 |
2022-02-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |