WY HB0032 | 2018 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - President Signed HEA No. 0018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to school finance; modifying the formula and payment structure for major maintenance funding for public K-12 schools; revising the definition of major maintenance; amending requirements for school building and facility assessments; revising priorities for school district facility plans; providing applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School finance-major maintenance formula.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-10-2-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 44-16-0-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-10-2-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 44-16-0-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0018
2018-03-07HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0018
2018-03-06 Assigned Number HEA No. 0018
2018-03-06Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
2018-03-05Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2018-03-02SenateCOW:Passed
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on General File
2018-03-01SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2018-02-28SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations
2018-02-28SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-02-27House3rd Reading:Passed 48-10-2-0-0
2018-02-23House2nd Reading:Passed
2018-02-22HouseCOW:Passed
2018-02-20HousePlaced on General File
2018-02-20HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2018-02-13HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 44-16-0-0-0
2018-02-09HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-12-29 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback