WY HB0028 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 86
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 86
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; amending the game and fish commission's authority to regulate the collection of shed antlers and big game animal horns as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Regulation of shed antler and big game horn collection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - Concur:Passed 45-12-3-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Assigned Chapter Number 86 | |
2019-02-26 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0064 | |
2019-02-22 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0064 |
2019-02-22 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0064 |
2019-02-21 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0064 | |
2019-02-21 | House | Concur:Passed 45-12-3-0-0 |
2019-02-20 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-12 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-17 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 |
2019-01-16 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-15 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-14 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2019-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-24 | Bill Number Assigned |