WY HB0028 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; providing for use of artificial lighting devices by person with visual disabilities; providing for additional antelope licenses for disabled hunters; repealing restrictions on disabled hunter companion permits; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Disabled hunter programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-11 - House - H06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-11 - House - H06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2013-02-15 | Governor Signed HEA0027 | |
2013-02-12 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0027 |
2013-02-12 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0027 |
2013-02-11 | Assigned Number HEA0027 | |
2013-02-11 | House | Did Concur |
2013-02-11 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-08 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-14 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-11 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-11 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 |
2013-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2012-12-03 | Bill Number Assigned |