WY HB0026 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Assigned Chapter Number 25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Assigned Chapter Number 25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to environmental quality; revising requirements for the continuation, termination and abandonment of limited mining operations as specified; providing for renewal of limited mining operations as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Limited mining operations-amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-1-2-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Assigned Chapter Number 25 | |
2019-02-14 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0012 | |
2019-02-11 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0012 |
2019-02-11 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0012 |
2019-02-08 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0012 | |
2019-02-08 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-1-2-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-06 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-04 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-24 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 |
2019-01-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-18 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2019-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-19 | Bill Number Assigned |