WY HB0026 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 87 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 87 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state lands; authorizing expenditures for bark beetle mitigation projects; specifying requirements for the expenditure of funds; providing a repeal date; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Bark beetle-program funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-20-2-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-20-2-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-20-2-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-20-2-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Chapter No. 87 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-06 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-06 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0051 | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0051 |
2017-02-23 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0051 |
2017-02-22 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0051 | |
2017-02-22 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-16 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-15 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-19 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 38-20-2-0-0 |
2017-01-18 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-17 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-17 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 |
2017-01-12 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2017-01-12 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-12 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2017-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-09 | Bill Number Assigned |