WY HB0026 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-4-1-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Wyoming Money Transmitter Act; amending definitions to include digital currency as a permissive investment; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming Money Transmitter Act-investments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-29 - House - DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-4-1- (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-4-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 51-7-2-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-29HouseDO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-4-1-
2016-02-19HouseNo report prior to COW Cutoff
2016-02-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 51-7-2-0-0
2016-02-05HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-01-20 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback