WY HB0026 | 2010 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the administration of government; amending the time for a claimant to file an expert's statement; specifying the admissibility in court of proceedings filed with and decisions by the medical review panel; requiring that litigation results be reported to the panel; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical review panel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-03 - Senate - S Adopted HB0026JC01 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-09 Assigned Chapter Number
2010-03-09 Governor Signed HEA No. 0056
2010-03-04 (S) President Signed HEA No. 0056
2010-03-04 (H) Speaker Signed HEA No. 0056
2010-03-04 Assigned Number HEA No. 0056
2010-03-03 (S) Adopted HB0026JC01
2010-03-03 (H) Adopted HB0026JC01
2010-03-01 (S) Appointed JCC01 Members
2010-03-01 (H) Appointed JCC01 Members
2010-03-01 (H) Did Not Concur
2010-02-26 (H) Received for Concurrence
2010-02-26 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2010-02-25 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2010-02-24 (S) Passed CoW
2010-02-19 (S) Placed on General File
2010-02-19 (S10) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2010-02-17 (S) Introduced and Referred to S10
2010-02-17 (S) Received for Introduction
2010-02-16 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2010-02-15 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2010-02-12 (H) Passed CoW
2010-02-11 (H) Placed on General File
2010-02-11 (H10) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2010-02-09 (H) Introduced and Referred to H10
2010-02-08 (H) Received for Introduction
2010-01-06 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback