WY HB0024 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the funding of government operations; providing funding for the replacement of a transportation computer system; creating an account; authorizing revenue increases; increasing driver's license, driver's permit and registration fees; specifying the distribution of fees; requiring reporting; providing for the governor's recommendation to repeal or amend the fee increase; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation computer system funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22HouseCOW:H Did not consider for COW
2021-03-02HousePlaced on General File
2021-03-02HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2021-03-01HouseH08 - Transportation:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2021-03-01HouseH08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2021-02-01HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2021-01-12HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-12-21 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback