WY HB0023 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 109
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education accountability; generally modifying provisions of the Wyoming Accountability in Education Act; conforming provisions; repealing a provision; requiring rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education accountability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - House - Adopted HB0023JC001: 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - Adopted HB0023JC001: 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Concur:Failed 2-57-1-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 109
2019-02-26 Governor Signed HEA No. 0043
2019-02-19SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0043
2019-02-19HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0043
2019-02-19 Assigned Number HEA No. 0043
2019-02-12SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-12HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-12HouseConcur:Failed 2-57-1-0-0
2019-02-11HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-11Senate3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0
2019-02-08Senate3rd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-07Senate3rd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-06Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-05SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-04SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-04SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2019-01-25SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23House3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
2019-01-22House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-18HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-17HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-17HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-12-18 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback