WY HB0022 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - President Signed HEA No. 0025
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - President Signed HEA No. 0025
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state parks and historic sites; authorizing the department of state parks and cultural resources to impose an admissions fee at Quebec 1 missile alert facility as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Quebec 1 missile alert facility-fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - Concur:Passed 51-9-0-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-4-3-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 51-9-0-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-4-3-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 51-9-0-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0025 |
2018-03-07 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0025 |
2018-03-06 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0025 | |
2018-03-06 | House | Concur:Passed 51-9-0-0-0 |
2018-03-05 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2018-03-05 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-03-01 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 53-4-3-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-16 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-14 | House | H06 - Travel:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2018-02-14 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 51-9-0-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-12-19 | Bill Number Assigned |