WY HB0020 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to legislative program evaluation; amending audit standard requirements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Program evaluation standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - House - Concur:Passed 39-19-2-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-19-2-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-19-2-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Assigned Chapter Number 168 | |
2019-02-28 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0099 | |
2019-02-26 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0099 |
2019-02-26 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0099 |
2019-02-25 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0099 | |
2019-02-25 | House | Concur:Passed 39-19-2-0-0 |
2019-02-22 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-22 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-15 | Senate | S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-16 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 39-19-2-0-0 |
2019-01-15 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-14 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-14 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-18 | Bill Number Assigned |