WY HB0019 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; specifying that private property may be designated by use of fluorescent orange or fluorescent pink paint; requiring the game and fish commission and the department of state parks and cultural resources to inform permittees concerning entry on and rights-of-way through private land; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Painted fenceposts-no trespassing.
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Crago [R] | Rep. Jamie Flitner [R] | Rep. Albert Sommers [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] |
Sen. Reynolds Kost [R] | Sen. Wendy Davis Schuler [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 49-10-1-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2022-02-25 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 49-10-1-0-0 |
2022-02-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-01-05 | Bill Number Assigned |