WY HB0019 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 85 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to sales tax; providing for collection of sales tax from remote sellers as specified; providing for a declaratory judgment action; providing an injunction during the pendency of the action; limiting liability for payment of the sales tax; implementing related provisions; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales from remote sellers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-21 - House - Concur:Passed 42-17-1-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - Concur:Passed 42-17-1-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-14-1-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-14-1-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-06 Chapter No. 85 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
2017-03-06 Assigned Chapter Number
2017-03-06 Governor Signed HEA No. 0041
2017-02-23SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0041
2017-02-22HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0041
2017-02-21 Assigned Number HEA No. 0041
2017-02-21HouseConcur:Passed 42-17-1-0-0
2017-02-15HouseReceived for Concurrence
2017-02-15Senate3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0
2017-02-14Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-13SenateCOW:Passed
2017-02-07SenatePlaced on General File
2017-02-07SenateS03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2017-01-31SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
2017-01-20SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-01-17House3rd Reading:Passed 45-14-1-0-0
2017-01-16House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-01-13HouseCOW:Passed
2017-01-13HousePlaced on General File
2017-01-13HouseH03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2017-01-10HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
2017-01-09HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-12-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback