WY HB0015 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 163 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; amending and conforming provisions relating to restoration of voting rights to felons; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restoration of voting rights by department of corrections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-05 - Senate - Adopted HB0015JC001: 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - Adopted HB0015JC001: 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Adopted HB0015JC001: 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - Adopted HB0015JC001: 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Concur:Failed 2-56-2-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - Concur:Failed 2-56-2-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-1-1-0 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12 Chapter No. 163 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-12 Governor Signed HEA No. 0106
2015-03-05SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0106
2015-03-05HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0106
2015-03-05 Assigned Number HEA No. 0106
2015-03-05SenateAdopted HB0015JC001: 29-0-1-0-0
2015-03-05HouseAdopted HB0015JC001: 58-0-2-0-0
2015-02-27SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-26HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-24HouseConcur:Failed 2-56-2-0-0
2015-02-23HouseReceived for Concurrence
2015-02-23Senate3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0
2015-02-20Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-19Senate2nd Reading:Laid Back
2015-02-18SenateCOW:Passed
2015-02-18SenatePlaced on General File
2015-02-18 Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2015-02-06SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2015-02-06SenatePlaced on General File
2015-02-06 Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-02-04SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2015-01-27SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-01-23House3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0
2015-01-22House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-21HouseCOW:Passed
2015-01-20HousePlaced on General File
2015-01-20 Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-1-1-0-0
2015-01-15HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2015-01-14HousePlaced on General File
2015-01-14 Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2015-01-13HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2015-01-13HouseReceived for Introduction
2014-12-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback