WY HB0015 | 2010 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to electrical safety and fire prevention; providing authority for the chief electrical inspector to investigate electrocutions; clarifying duties of the department of electrical safety and fire prevention, the council on fire prevention and electrical safety in buildings and the electrical board; transferring rulemaking authority to the department of electrical safety and fire prevention; providing definitions; providing for amendment of plan reviews; providing for phased applications for plan reviews; amending projects requiring plan reviews; providing for suspension or restriction of licenses for failure to pay child support; providing for supremacy of the National Electrical Code; amending certain fees; specifying qualifications for local inspectors; providing for reversion of enforcement authority; modifying appeals process from local inspection authorities to the department; providing for reciprocal licenses; amending license fee revenue allocations; providing waiver of master or journeyman licensing requirement for installation, repair or maintenance of certain lawn sprinkler systems by persons who obtain a limited electrical contractor's license; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electrical safety and fire prevention-revisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-03 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-09 Assigned Chapter Number
2010-03-09 Governor Signed HEA No. 0055
2010-03-04 (S) President Signed HEA No. 0055
2010-03-04 (H) Speaker Signed HEA No. 0055
2010-03-04 Assigned Number HEA No. 0055
2010-03-03 (H) Did Concur
2010-03-03 (H) Received for Concurrence
2010-03-03 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2010-03-02 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2010-03-01 (S) Passed CoW
2010-02-26 (S) Placed on General File
2010-02-26 (S02) Recommended Do Pass
2010-02-25 (S) Rereferred to S02
2010-02-25 (S) Placed on General File
2010-02-25 (S07) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2010-02-22 (S) Introduced and Referred to S07
2010-02-22 (S) Received for Introduction
2010-02-19 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2010-02-18 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2010-02-17 (H) Passed CoW
2010-02-16 (H) Placed on General File
2010-02-16 (H02) Recommended Do Pass
2010-02-12 (H) Rereferred to H02
2010-02-12 (H) Placed on General File
2010-02-12 (H07) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2010-02-09 (H) Introduced and Referred to H07
2010-02-08 (H) Received for Introduction
2009-12-22 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback