WY HB0013 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the regulation of alcoholic and malt beverages; creating, revising and repealing provisions governing the regulation of alcoholic and malt beverages; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverage regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - House - Concur:Passed 39-19-2-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-0-0-2 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-0-0-0-2 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-10-1-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - Amendment adopted 31-28-1-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-0-0-2 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-0-0-0-2 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-10-1-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - Amendment adopted 31-28-1-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | Assigned Chapter Number 22 | |
2021-02-09 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0017 | |
2021-02-05 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0017 |
2021-02-05 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0017 |
2021-02-05 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0017 | |
2021-02-05 | House | Concur:Passed 39-19-2-0-0 |
2021-02-04 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2021-02-04 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-0-0-2 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-02-02 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-0-0-0-2 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-01-29 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 49-10-1-0-0 |
2021-01-28 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-01-27 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-01-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-01-27 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2021-01-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-12-18 | Bill Number Assigned |