WY HB0013 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Uniform Commercial Code; modifying filing requirements to allow for electronic filings of effective financing statements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
UCC liens-electronic filing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H07 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H07 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2014-03-10 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0024 | |
2014-03-04 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0024 |
2014-03-03 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0024 |
2014-03-03 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0024 | |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed COW |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed COW |
2014-02-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-18 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 |
2014-02-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-12-18 | Bill Number Assigned |