WY HB0012 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - COW:Failed 1-28-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to game and fish; modifying regulation of the collection of shed antlers and horns of big game animals as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Shed antlers and horns.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - COW:Failed 1-28-1-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21SenateCOW:Failed 1-28-1-0-0
2019-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-12SenateS06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S06 - Travel
2019-01-17SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-17House3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0
2019-01-16House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-15HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-14HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-14HouseH06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06 - Travel
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-12-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback