WY HB0012 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to speed limits; establishing a maximum speed limit declarable by state authorities; modifying and clarifying the state superintendent's ability to designate higher speed limits; amending the identification of speeding violations that are kept in state records; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Eighty miles per hour speed limit.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Lubnau [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Rep. Dave Zwonitzer [R] | Sen. Tony Ross [R] |
Sen. Michael Von Flatern [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H08 (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H08 (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2014-03-07 | Governor Signed HEA0042 | |
2014-03-05 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0042 |
2014-03-04 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0042 |
2014-03-04 | Assigned Number HEA0042 | |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-03-03 | Amendment Failed | |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-24 | Amendment Failed | |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed CoW |
2014-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-20 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-19 | House | Rereferred to H02 |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-19 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 |
2014-02-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-12-18 | Bill Number Assigned |