WY HB0011 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Chapter No. 143 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the department of revenue; requiring a study on discounted cash flow valuation for oil and gas as specified; requiring a report; providing a definition; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discounted cash flow implementation process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-21-1-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-21-1-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-08 Chapter No. 143 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
2017-03-08 Assigned Chapter Number
2017-03-08 Governor Signed HEA No. 0085
2017-03-01SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0085
2017-03-01HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0085
2017-03-01 Assigned Number HEA No. 0085
2017-02-28Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
2017-02-27Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-24SenateCOW:Passed
2017-02-21SenatePlaced on General File
2017-02-21SenateS03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2017-01-31SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
2017-01-26SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-01-24House3rd Reading:Passed 38-21-1-0-0
2017-01-23House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-01-20HouseCOW:Passed
2017-01-19HousePlaced on General File
2017-01-19HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2017-01-16HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2017-01-13HousePlaced on General File
2017-01-13HouseH03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2017-01-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
2017-01-09HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-12-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback