WY HB0011 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 157 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the study of distance education for informing recalibration of the education resource block grant model; establishing a task force; establishing duties; requiring reporting; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Distance education task force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-04 - Senate - Adopted HB0011JC001: 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Adopted HB0011JC001: 50-8-2-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Adopted HB0011JC001: 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Adopted HB0011JC001: 50-8-2-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Concur:Failed 2-56-2-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - House - Concur:Failed 2-56-2-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-8-1-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-13-0-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-13-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12 Chapter No. 157 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-12 Governor Signed HEA No. 0101
2015-03-05SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0101
2015-03-05HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0101
2015-03-04 Assigned Number HEA No. 0101
2015-03-04SenateAdopted HB0011JC001: 28-1-1-0-0
2015-03-04HouseAdopted HB0011JC001: 50-8-2-0-0
2015-02-27SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-26HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-26HouseConcur:Failed 2-56-2-0-0
2015-02-25HouseReceived for Concurrence
2015-02-25Senate3rd Reading:Passed 21-8-1-0-0
2015-02-24Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-23SenateCOW:Passed
2015-02-23SenatePlaced on General File
2015-02-23 Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-02-20SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2015-02-20SenatePlaced on General File
2015-02-20 Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2015-02-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-02-09House3rd Reading:Passed 47-13-0-0-0
2015-02-06House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-05HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-05HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-05 Rerefer to HCOW
2015-01-28HouseCOW:Rerefer to H04 - Education
2015-01-28HousePlaced on General File
2015-01-28 Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2015-01-26 Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2015-01-26HousePlaced on General File
2015-01-26 Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2015-01-13HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2015-01-13HouseReceived for Introduction
2014-12-12 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback