WY HB0011 | 2014 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Wyoming Controlled Substances Act; adding specified controlled substances to Schedule I of the act; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - S01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H01 (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-11 Assigned Chapter Number
2014-03-10 Governor Signed HEA0012
2014-03-04SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0012
2014-02-28HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0012
2014-02-28 Assigned Number HEA0012
2014-02-28SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-27SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-26SenatePassed CoW
2014-02-26SenatePlaced on General File
2014-02-26SenateRecommended Do Pass
2014-02-25SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01
2014-02-25SenateReceived for Introduction
2014-02-24HousePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-21HousePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-20HousePassed CoW
2014-02-20 Amendment Adopted
2014-02-20 Amendment Adopted
2014-02-20HouseAmendments Adopted
2014-02-14HousePlaced on General File
2014-02-14HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2014-02-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01
2014-02-10HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-12-13 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback