WY HB0010 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; creating crimes relating to critical infrastructure; specifying elements; providing penalties; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes against critical infrastructure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-01 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04HouseDid Not Consider in CoW
2019-02-01HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-01HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-12-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback