WY HB0009 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 117
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to standards for antifreeze and petroleum products; modifying required enforcement; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Antifreeze and petroleum product enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-0-4-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 117
2019-02-26 Governor Signed HEA No. 0074
2019-02-22SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0074
2019-02-22HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0074
2019-02-21 Assigned Number HEA No. 0074
2019-02-21Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-02-20Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-19SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-14SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-14SenateS08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
2019-01-22SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-22House3rd Reading:Passed 56-0-4-0-0
2019-01-18House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-17HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-16HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-16HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-12-13 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback