WY HB0009 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicle license plates; authorizing special Eastern Shoshone Indian tribe license plates and Northern Arapaho Indian tribe license plates; specifying requirements; authorizing a fee; providing for termination of the issuance of the special plates as specified; requiring a report upon termination; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Tribal license plates.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 41-18-1- (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 41-18-1- (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Did Not Consider for Introduction |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-18 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-1-0-0 |
2016-02-17 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-16 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-11 | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-10 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-10 | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 41-18-1- |
2016-02-05 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-12-31 | Bill Number Assigned |