WY HB0008 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to school finance; modifying the formula for major maintenance funding for public K-12 schools; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Major maintenance multiplier.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-05 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 35-24-1-0-0 (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26Senatepostponed indefinitely
2019-02-05SenateS02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations
2019-01-28SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-28House3rd Reading:Passed 35-24-1-0-0
2019-01-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-24HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-23HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-23HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-12-13 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback