WY HB0008 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Chapter No. 46 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Chapter No. 46 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation and revenue; revising the authority of the department of revenue to adopt rules related to the appraisal methods of county assessors; repealing related provisions accordingly; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Property assessment test rules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-04 | Chapter No. 46 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016 | |
2016-03-04 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2016-03-04 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0021 | |
2016-03-01 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0021 |
2016-03-01 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0021 |
2016-03-01 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0021 | |
2016-03-01 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-26 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-25 | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-15 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 |
2016-02-12 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-11 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-10 | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 58-0-2-0-0 |
2016-02-05 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-12-30 | Bill Number Assigned |