WY HB0007 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Chapter No. 29 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Chapter No. 29 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to insurance; revising reinsurer requirements; establishing procedures relating to reinsurer suspension and revocation; mandating reinsurers manage reinsurance recoverables and programs as specified; creating notification requirements under specified conditions; specifying the insurance commissioner's rulemaking authority applicable to reinsurance arrangements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Credit for reinsurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Chapter No. 29 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-02-21 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0021 | |
2017-02-15 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0021 |
2017-02-14 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0021 |
2017-02-13 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0021 | |
2017-02-13 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2017-02-10 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-07 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-17 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2017-01-16 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-13 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-13 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-13 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2017-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-01 | Bill Number Assigned |