WY HB0007 | 2012 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - (S) Placed on General File; Did not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to livestock; repealing provisions for participation in a national livestock identification program; establishing a Wyoming livestock identification and traceability program; providing penalties for violations; authorizing rulemaking; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voluntary livestock identification program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-02 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - S05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 32 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H05 (Y: 47 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-02 (S) Placed on General File; Did not Consider in COW
2012-03-02 (S02) Recommended Do Pass
2012-03-02 (S) Rereferred to S02
2012-03-02 (S) Placed on General File
2012-03-02 (S05) Recommended Do Pass
2012-02-29 (S) Introduced and Referred to S05
2012-02-29 (S) Received for Introduction
2012-02-28 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-02-27 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-02-24 (H) Passed CoW
2012-02-24 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-24 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-24 (H) Amendments Adopted
2012-02-22 (H) Placed on General File
2012-02-22 (H02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2012-02-21 (H) Rereferred to H02
2012-02-21 (H) Placed on General File
2012-02-21 (H05) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2012-02-13 (H) Introduced and Referred to H05
2012-02-13 (H) Received for Introduction
2011-12-29 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback